Hanran, Patrick Francis
Personal
Birth Date:
16 September 1831 (Limerick)
Death Date:
8 August 1916 (Townsville, Queensland)
Parents:
Francis Hanran and Bridget (nee Hayes)
Family:
Mary Anne Ogle on 17 September 1864 in Sydney, 2 sons, 5 daughters
Education:
Christian Brothers' School, Sydney
Religion:
Roman Catholic
Career
Goldminer, Turon, 1851; Goldminer, Macquarie, Louisa Creek, Dirt Hole Creek, Bendigo, Ballarat, Ararat and Ovens; Speculator, Eureka, 1854; Miner, Gabriel's Gully, Tuapeka, New Zealand, 1861; Storekeeper, Townsville, 1866
Local Government Service:
Alderman of Townsville, for 27 years; Mayor of Townsville, 1871-1872, 1876-1877, 1879, 1882, 1893
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | MIN | Townsville | 11 Mar 1899 | 2 Oct 1909 | Resigned |
Additional Information
Notes:
Member, School of Arts and Orphanage Committees; Member, Council of Northern Separation Movement; Member, Cleveland Bay Immigration Board; President: Townsville Harbour Board, Townsville Hospital Board; Director, Townsville Gas Co
Sources:
Image courtesy of John Oxley Library, State Library of Queensland, Neg: 187123
[Last Modified: Tuesday, 25 July 2017]