Edwards, Llewellyn Roy, AC (Llew)
Personal
Birth Date:
2 August 1935 (Ipswich, Queensland)
Death Date:
26 May 2021 (, Queensland)
Parents:
Roy T Edwards and Agnes (nee Llewellyn)
Family:
(2) Jane Brumfield on 25 November 1989, (1) Leone Burley on 15 February 1958, 2 sons, 1 daughter
Education:
Raceview and Silkstone state schools; Ipswich Grammar; Ipswich Technical College; Bachelor of Medicine and Bachelor of Surgery, University of Queensland, 1958 to 1965
Religion:
Congregational
Career
Medical practitioner at Raceview, 1969 to 1972; Surgical Registrar, Ipswich General Hospital, 1968; RMO, Ipswich General Hospital, 1965 to 1967; Electrician, 1952 to 1958
Party Positions:
- Member, Liberal Party State Executive.
- Member, Liberal Party Federal Council.
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | LIB | Ipswich | 27 May 1972 | 22 Oct 1983 | Did not contest |
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Deputy Leader, Queensland Delegation to Australian Constitutional Convention | ||
Member, Standing Orders Committee | Apr 1979 | |
Treasurer and Deputy Premier | 15 Dec 1978 | 18 Aug 1983 |
Leader of the Liberal Party | 9 Oct 1978 | 9 Aug 1983 |
Deputy Premier and Minister for Health | 9 Oct 1978 | 15 Dec 1978 |
Leader, Parliamentary Delegation to Indonesia, Japan and South East Asia | 1976 | |
Minister for Health | 23 Dec 1974 | 9 Oct 1978 |
Additional Information
Notes:
Interests include youth activities, aged and handicapped persons programs, music, rugby union, cricket and tennis. Sir Llew led several trade missions for the government and acted as chief negotiator on overseas loans and major state government contracts. Chairman and a member of many boards including Northern Securities Management Trust, Westpac Bank Board, Australian Guarantee Corporation, TVQ-10, James Hardie Industries, Peregrine Capital Australia, Brisbane World Trade Centre Board, Commonwealth government Tourism Taskforce and Pacific Film and Television Corporation
Sources:
Image sourced from the collection of the Queensland Parliamentary Library and Research Service; Waterson, DB and John Arnold, A Biographical Register of the Queensland Parliament: 1930-1980, (Canberra: ANU Press, 1982); Good Weekend, `Knight of the long knives', Nikki Barrowclough
[Last Modified: Tuesday, 16 November 2021]