Hegarty, John Joseph
Personal
Birth Date:
16 September 1947
Family:
1 son, 1 daughter
Career
Insurance consultant
Military Service:
Served in Regular Army, 1964 to 1969, which included service in Vietnam, 1967 to 1968; Served in the infantry, military police and artillery units; Commissioned Officer, 1971 to 1994
Party Positions:
- Member, Redlands/Springwood Electorate Council.
- Member, Ministerial Legislative Committees: Environment; Education; Public Works and Housing. Apr 1996 - Jun 1998
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | NP | Redlands | 15 Jul 1995 | 17 Feb 2001 |
Speeches:
All Speeches
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Member, Parliamentary Criminal Justice Committee | 30 Jul 1998 | 23 Jan 2001 |
Deputy Opposition Whip | 29 Jun 1998 | 17 Feb 2001 |
Member, Members' Ethics and Parliamentary Privileges Committee | 3 Mar 1998 | 19 May 1998 |
Member, Estimates Committee F | 4 Jun 1997 | 8 Jul 1997 |
Member, Estimates Committee C | 3 Sep 1996 | 8 Oct 1996 |
Member, Select Committee on Travelsafe | 2 Apr 1996 | 19 May 1998 |
Additional Information
Notes:
Interests include physical fitness activities; Mr Hegarty was the recipient of a Reserve Forces Decoration. Member, Parliamentary Bowls Team; Member, Logan Chamber of Commerce, East Logan Wildlife Preservation Society
Sources:
Image sourced from the collection of Queensland Parliamentary Library and Research Service
[Last Modified: Tuesday, 18 July 2017]