Sullivan, Terry
Personal
Birth Date:
6 February 1949 (Brisbane, Queensland)
Parents:
Keith James Sullivan and Veronica Magdalene (nee Gilroy)
Family:
Patricia Mary Bartlett on 5 January 1976, 4 sons, 1 daughter
Education:
St Agatha's, Clayfield; St Columban's College, Albion Heights; Bachelor of Education
Religion:
Roman Catholic
Career
School teacher in non-government schools specialising in lower secondary area; Former member, Council of Queensland Association for Teachers and Independent Schools (QATIS); QATIS nominee on the Board of Teacher Education
Party Positions:
- Member of the Australian Labor Party since 1981.
- Member, Minsterial Legislative Committees: Education, Arts, Health, Public Works, Housing, Racing, Transport, Main Roads, Child Safety, Communities, Disability Services and Seniors, from 1 Oct 2004.
- Member, Minsterial Legislative Committee: Aboriginal and Torres Strait Islander Policy, from 1 October 2004.
- Member, Minsterial Legislative Committees: Education; Health; Families, ATSI Policy and Disability Services; Innovation and Information Technology, from March 2001.
- Member, Minsterial Legislative Committees: Transport and Main Roads; Education; Families, Youth and Community Care and Disability Services; Health, July 1998 to January 2001.
- Member, Minsterial Legislative Committees: Health, May 1991 to February 1996.
- Member, Minsterial Legislative Committees: Education; Transport; Family and Community Services, September 1995 to February 1996.
- Member, Minsterial Legislative Committee: Family Services and Aboriginal and Islander Affairs, from 1991 to 1995.
- Member, Minsterial Legislative Committees: Education; Police, from 1991 to 1992.
- Member, Minsterial Legislative Committees: Deputy Premier's; Business, Industry and Regional Development, from 1992 to 1995.
- Member, Shadow Ministerial Legislative Committees: Education; Families, Youth and Community Care; Transport; Health, February 1996 to June 1998.
- State Conference Delegate (Lilley Division).
- Branch President and Branch Secretary (Chermside Kedron Branch).
- Delegate to local Party Units (Federal Electoral Council, State Electoral Council and Municipal Electoral Council).
- Campaign Committee member and Campaign Director for local, state and federal campaigns.
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | ALP | Nundah | 18 May 1991 | 19 Sep 1992 | By-election |
Assembly | ALP | Chermside | 19 Sep 1992 | 17 Feb 2001 | |
Assembly | ALP | Stafford | 17 Feb 2001 | 9 Sep 2006 | Did not contest |
Speeches:
All Speeches
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Member, Estimates Committee D | 22 Jun 2000 | 21 Aug 2000 |
Chairman, Estimates Committee D | 15 Sep 1998 | 19 Oct 1998 |
Government Whip | 30 Jul 1998 | 9 Sep 2006 |
Member, Select Committee on Travelsafe | 30 Jul 1998 | 23 Jan 2001 |
Deputy Chairman, Select Committee on Travelsafe | 2 Apr 1996 | 19 May 1998 |
Deputy Opposition Whip | 20 Feb 1996 | 19 May 1998 |
Member, Select Committee on Travelsafe | 15 Sep 1995 | 2 Apr 1996 |
Deputy Government Whip | 7 Sep 1995 | 19 Feb 1996 |
Member, Estimates Committee B | 31 Mar 1995 | 13 Jun 1995 |
Member, Estimates Committee B | 28 Apr 1994 | 23 Jun 1994 |
Member, Public Works Committee | 10 Nov 1992 | 20 Jun 1995 |
Additional Information
Notes:
Interests include photography, philately and sports. Member, Queensland Irish Association and various local community groups
Sources:
Image sourced from the collection of the Queensland Parliamentary Library and Research Service
[Last Modified: Thursday, 04 February 2021]