Slack, Douglas John (Doug)
Personal
Birth Date:
5 April 1941 (Gayndah, Queensland)
Parents:
Cyril Edward Slack and Elsie May (nee Anderson)
Family:
Sandra Majorie Guy on 17 June 1967, 4 sons
Education:
Primary correspondence; Barambah Creek School; Gayndah Primary; Church of England Grammar School
Religion:
Church of England
Career
Farmer/Cattleman/Businessman
Party Positions:
- Former State President, Young National Party.
- Chairman, Burnett Electorate Council.
- Chairman, Hinkler Divisional Council.
- State Vice-President, Wide Bay Zone.
- Chairman, Ministerial Legislative Committee: Education.
- Member, Ministerial Legislative Committees: Youth and Sport; Primary Industries; Finance; Land Management; Environment; Conservation and Tourism; Water Resources and Maritime Services.
- Member, Ministerial Legislative Committee: Family Services and Welfare Housing.
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | NP | Burnett | 1 Nov 1986 | 17 Feb 2001 |
Speeches:
All Speeches
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Member, Estimates Committee E | 22 Jun 2000 | 22 Aug 2000 |
Member, Estimates Committee A | 27 Aug 1999 | 25 Oct 1999 |
Shadow Minister for State Development and Trade | 26 Feb 1999 | 17 Feb 2001 |
Member, Estimates Committee E | 15 Sep 1998 | 20 Oct 1998 |
Member, Public Accounts Committee | 30 Jul 1998 | 23 Jan 2001 |
Minister for Economic Development and Trade and Minister Assisting the Premier | 26 Feb 1996 | 26 Jun 1998 |
Member, Estimates Committee D | 31 Mar 1995 | 13 Jun 1995 |
Member, Estimates Committee D | 28 Apr 1994 | 23 Jun 1994 |
Shadow Minister for Environment and Heritage | Nov 1992 | 19 Feb 1996 |
Member, Privileges Committee | 12 Nov 1992 | 18 Oct 1994 |
Oppositions Spokesman on Family Services and Aboriginal and Islander Affairs and Treasury | 1990 | 1992 |
Member, Public Works Committee | 1989 |
Additional Information
Notes:
Interests include family, tennis, travel and politics
Sources:
Image sourced from the collection of the Queensland Parliamentary Library and Research Service
[Last Modified: Tuesday, 08 August 2017]