Bligh, Anna Maria, AC
Personal
Birth Date:
13 July 1960 (Warwick, Queensland)
Family:
Greg Withers, 2 sons
Education:
Bachelor of Arts, University of Queensland
Career
Senior Policy Officer, Department of Employment, Vocational Education, Training and Industrial Relations; Worked in community organisations including women's refuges and neighbourhood centres; Experience in childcare services and trade unions' Chief Executive Officer and Company Secretary, YWCA NSW since 2013; Non-Executive Director, Medibank Private since December 2012; Non-Executive Director, Bangarra Dance Company since 2012; Member, Chief Executive Women
Party Positions:
- Member State Administrative Committee.
- Member Labor Women's Organisation.
- State Conference Delegate; Branch President, Kurilpa. 1993 - 1995
- Convenor Social Justice Policy Committee. 1991 - 1994
- Branch Secretary, Fairfield. 1987 - 1988
- State Council Delegate.
- National President. 2010 - 2011
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | ALP | South Brisbane | 15 Jul 1995 | 2 Apr 2012 | Resigned |
Speeches:
Inaugural Speech
|
All Speeches
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Member, Committee of the Legislative Assembly | 10 Mar 2011 | 23 Mar 2012 |
Minister for Reconstruction | 21 Feb 2011 | 26 Mar 2012 |
Member, Standing Orders Committee | 23 Apr 2009 | 19 May 2011 |
Minister for the Arts | 26 Mar 2009 | 21 Feb 2011 |
Premier of Queensland | 13 Sep 2007 | 26 Mar 2012 |
Member, Standing Orders Committee | 11 Oct 2006 | 20 Mar 2009 |
Deputy Premier, Treasurer and Minister for Infrastructure | 13 Sep 2006 | 13 Sep 2007 |
Deputy Premier, Treasurer and Minister for State Development, Trade and Innovation | 2 Feb 2006 | 13 Sep 2006 |
Deputy Premier and Minister for Finance, Minister for State Development, Trade and Innovation | 28 Jul 2005 | 2 Feb 2006 |
Minister for Education and The Arts | 12 Feb 2004 | 28 Jul 2005 |
Member, Standing Orders Committee | 3 May 2001 | 15 Aug 2006 |
Leader of Government Parliamentary Business | 22 Mar 2001 | 9 Aug 2005 |
Minister for Education | 22 Feb 2001 | 12 Feb 2004 |
Minister for Families, Youth and Community Care and Minister for Disability Services | 29 Jun 1998 | 22 Feb 2001 |
Member, Estimates Committee G | 1997 | 1997 |
Member, Estimates Committee F | 1996 | 1996 |
Shadow Minister for Families, Youth and Community Care | 17 Dec 1996 | 26 Jun 1998 |
Shadow Minister for Public Works, Administrative Services and Public Service Matters | 27 Feb 1996 | 17 Dec 1996 |
Member, Legal, Constitutional and Administrative Review Committee | 15 Sep 1995 | 2 Apr 1996 |
Additional Information
Notes:
First female Premier of Queensland. Areas of policy interests include early childhood education and services, employment and industrial relations, urban renewal and social infrastructure. Hobbies include reading and cooking
Sources:
Image sourced from the collection of the Queensland Parliamentary Library and Research Service; Queensland Parliament, Members List, Biography, http://www.parliament.qld.gov.au/
[Last Modified: Wednesday, 08 February 2017]