Fyfe, Alexander
Personal
Birth Date:
1827 (Scotland)
Death Date:
1 May 1903 (Preston, Victoria)
Family:
Jane Nicholson Bailiff in Geelong
Religion:
Presbyterian
Career
Ironmonger's assistant; Acquired property in Geelong; Secretary, Anti-Gold Licence Commission, Ballarat; Became pastoralist in Peak Downs; Auctioneer in Rockhampton; Director, Melbourne to Geelong Railway
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | NONE | Rockhampton | 20 Jun 1870 | 24 Nov 1873 |
Additional Information
Notes:
President: Geelong Agricultural Society, Mechanics Institute; Captain, Geelong Volunteer Rifle Corps, 1855
Sources:
Image courtesy of the Victorian Parliament; Waterson, DB, A Biographical Register of the Queensland Parliament: 1860-1929, 2nd revised edition (Sydney: Casket Publications, 2001); Geelong Advertiser, 10 March 1862; Age, 5 May 1903; Australasian, 9 May 1903
[Last Modified: Wednesday, 05 July 2017]