Palaszczuk, Heinrich (Henry)
Personal
Birth Date:
12 January 1947
Parents:
Hipolit Palaszczuk and Ludwika (nee Boba)
Family:
4 daughters
Education:
Darr Canvent; St Edmunds Ipswich; Kelvin Grove Teachers College; Queensland University
Religion:
Roman Catholic
Career
Schoolteacher
Party Positions:
- Secretary, Opposition Primary Industry Committee in 45th Parliament.
- Member, Ministerial Legislative Committees: Treasury; Police and Corrective Services; Minerals and Energy. Sep 1995 - Feb 1996
- Member, Ministerial Legislative Committees: Treasury; Primary Industries. Sep 1992 - Jul 1995
- Member, Ministerial Legislative Committees: Health; Tourism; Environment; Valuation and Administrative Services; National Parks; Sport; the Arts. 1984 - 1989
- Secretary, Inala Branch ALP. 1980 - 1987
- President, Rankin Federal Divisional Executive. 1984 - 1986
- President, Inala Metropolitan Executive Committee. 1982 - 1986
- President, Archerfield Electorate Executive Committee. 1982 - 1986
- Campaign Director, Brisbane Municipal Campaign 1985, 1988, 1991 and 1994.
- Campaign Director, Rankin Federal Divisional Electorate, 1990 and 1993.
- Delegate, ALP State Conference, 1984, 1988, 1992 and 1994.
- Delegate, ALP State Council. 1984 - 1991
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | ALP | Archerfield | 19 May 1984 | 19 Sep 1992 | By-election |
Assembly | ALP | Inala | 19 Sep 1992 | 9 Sep 2006 | Did not contest |
Speeches:
All Speeches
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Minister for Natural Resources and Mines and Minister Assisting the Premier on Water | 7 Aug 2006 | 13 Sep 2006 |
Minister for Natural Resources, Mines and Water | 2 Feb 2006 | 7 Aug 2006 |
Minister for Natural Resources and Mines | 28 Jul 2005 | 2 Feb 2006 |
Minister for Primary Industries and Fisheries | 12 Feb 2004 | 28 Jul 2005 |
Minister for Rural Communities | 16 Dec 1999 | 12 Feb 2004 |
Minister for Primary Industries | 29 Jun 1998 | 12 Feb 2004 |
Shadow Minister for Primary Industries | 7 Oct 1997 | 26 Jun 1998 |
Member, Estimates Committee E | 4 Jun 1997 | 8 Jul 1997 |
Shadow Minister for Natural Resources, Rural Communities and Multicultural and Ethnic Affairs | 17 Dec 1996 | 7 Oct 1997 |
Member, Estimates Committee E | 3 Sep 1996 | 8 Oct 1996 |
Shadow Minister for Natural Resources and Multicultural and Ethnic Affairs | 27 Feb 1996 | 17 Dec 1996 |
Member, Standing Orders Committee | 15 Sep 1995 | 17 Apr 1996 |
Member, Select Committee for Members' Interests | 10 Nov 1992 | 20 Jun 1995 |
Chairman of Committees | 10 Mar 1992 | 1 Apr 1996 |
Member, Parliamentary Service Commission | 10 Mar 1992 | 14 Jul 1995 |
Member, Library Advisory Committee | 1 Mar 1992 | 31 Jul 1995 |
Delegate to 21st Pacific and Australian Regional CPA Conference | 1991 | |
Member of Parliamentary Trade Delegation to South East Asia | 1990 | |
Deputy Government Whip | 1 Mar 1990 | 10 Mar 1992 |
Deputy Chairman, Public Works Committee; and Member, Library Advisory Committee | 1 Jan 1989 | 31 Dec 1989 |
Member, Printing Committee | 1 Jan 1987 | 31 Dec 1989 |
Member, Select Committee of Privileges | 1 Jan 1986 | 31 Dec 1989 |
Additional Information
Notes:
Interests include photographing scenes of rural Queensland, reading for recreation, keen follower of all major sports
Sources:
Image sourced from the collection of the Queensland Parliamentary Library and Research Service
[Last Modified: Wednesday, 30 August 2017]