Watson, David John Hopetoun
Personal
Birth Date:
29 January 1945 (Sydney, New South Wales)
Family:
2 sons
Education:
B.Com.(Hons), AAUQ(Qld), MA, PhD (Ohio State), FCPA, FCA
Career
Professor of Accounting and Business Finance, University of Queensland, 1978 to 1989; Head, Department of Commerce, 1978 to 1982; Dean, Faculty of Commerce and Economics, 1983 to 1984 and 1988 to 1989
Party Positions:
- Secretary, Ryan Area Executive. 1982 - 1985
- Member, Liberal Party State Executive (Qld). 1983 - 1985
- Vice-President, Liberal Party (Qld). 1988 - 1990
- Party Secretary, Parliamentary Liberal Party. Dec 1989 - 24 Sep 1992
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | LIB | Moggill | 2 Dec 1989 | 7 Feb 2004 | Did not contest |
Speeches:
All Speeches
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Member, Select Committee on the Consequences of Changing Political Status | 14 Oct 2003 | 13 Jan 2004 |
Member, Estimates Committee F | 30 Apr 2003 | 19 Aug 2003 |
Shadow Minister for Innovation and Information Economy | 22 Apr 2003 | 7 Feb 2004 |
Shadow Minister for Energy | 22 Apr 2003 | 7 Feb 2004 |
Deputy Opposition Whip | 22 Apr 2003 | 7 Feb 2004 |
Queensland Branch Delegate to the 48th Commonwealth Parliamentary Conference in Namibia | Sep 2002 | |
Deputy Chair, Public Accounts Committee | 3 May 2001 | 13 Jan 2004 |
Member, Estimates Committee E | 22 Jun 2000 | 22 Aug 2000 |
Member, Estimates Committee A | 27 Aug 1999 | 25 Oct 1999 |
Member, Estimates Committee A | 15 Sep 1998 | 19 Oct 1998 |
Member, Standing Orders Committee | 30 Jul 1998 | 23 Jan 2001 |
Member, Select Committee on Parliamentary Entitlements | 30 Jul 1998 | 30 Oct 1998 |
Shadow Treasurer and Shadow Minister for Communications and Information | 2 Jul 1998 | 17 Feb 2001 |
Leader of the Parliamentary Liberal Party | 23 Jun 1998 | 28 Feb 2001 |
Minister for Public Works and Housing | 28 Apr 1997 | 26 Jun 1998 |
Queensland Branch Delegate to the 42nd Commonwealth Parliamentary Conference in Kuala Lumpur | Aug 1996 | |
Parliamentary Representative, University of Queensland Senate | 18 Apr 1996 | |
Parliamentary Secretary to the Deputy Premier, Treasurer and Minister for The Arts | 26 Feb 1996 | 28 Apr 1997 |
Member, Members' Ethics and Parliamentary Privileges Committee | 15 Sep 1995 | 2 Apr 1996 |
Parliamentary Secretary, Joint Coalition Parties | Nov 1992 | 2 May 1997 |
Member, Parliamentary Criminal Justice Committee | 10 Nov 1992 | 20 Jun 1995 |
Member, Queensland Parliamentary Delegation to Japan, Korea, Hong Kong and Indonesia | Oct 1990 | |
Deputy Leader of the Parliamentary Liberal Party | 13 May 1990 | 24 Sep 1992 |
Member, Privileges Committee | Mar 1990 | 20 Jun 1995 |
Member, Public Accounts Committee | 6 Mar 1990 | 25 Aug 1992 |
Additional Information
Notes:
Interests include tennis and rugby
Sources:
Image sourced from the collection of the Queensland Parliamentary Library and Research Service
[Last Modified: Monday, 01 January 0001]