Stodart, James
Personal
Birth Date:
15 September 1849 (Edinburgh)
Death Date:
20 June 1922 (Ascot, Queensland)
Parents:
James Dickson Stodart and Louisa Margaretha (nee Meinecke)
Family:
Elizabeth Henrietta Noble Gair on 22 October 1878 in Toorak, 2 sons, 1 daughter
Education:
Scotch College, Melbourne
Religion:
Church of England
Career
Brisbane merchant and sugar dealer; Director, Mt Jukes Coffee Co.; Director, Millaquin Sugar Co.; Chairman of Directors, Mackay Coffee Co.; Director, Mutual Life Association of Australasia Ltd.; Vice-consul for Sweden in Queensland, 1906; Consul for Sweden in Queensland, 1913-1922; President, Brisbane Chamber of Commerce
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | MIN | Logan | 15 Aug 1896 | 16 Mar 1918 | By-election |
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Chairman of Committees | 13 Jul 1911 | 15 Apr 1915 |
Additional Information
Notes:
Member, Queensland Club; Member, Queensland National and Industrial Association; Member, Royal Geographic Society Queensland; Chairman, Brisbane Hospital Board; Trustee, Brisbane Grammar School and Brisbane cemetery
Sources:
Image courtesy of John Oxley Library, State Library of Queensland, Neg:41044; Waterson, DB, A Biographical Register of the Queensland Parliament: 1860-1929, 2nd revised edition (Sydney: Casket Publications, 2001); Lougheed, A L, 'Stodart, James (1849-1922)', Australian Dictionary of Biography, V.12, Melbourne University Press, 1990, pp 95-96
[Last Modified: Tuesday, 22 August 2017]