Vowles, William John
Personal
Birth Date:
22 April 1876 (Enoggera, Queensland)
Death Date:
28 August 1943 (Dalby, Queensland)
Parents:
George Vowles and Georgina Maria Cecilia (nee Kean)
Family:
Grace Lyndley Black on 1 December 1903, 3 sons, 3 daughters
Education:
Ipswich and Brisbane Grammar schools
Religion:
Roman Catholic
Career
Articled, J.G. McGregor, Brisbane solicitor, 1892; Director, Chinchilla Co-Operative Dairy Co.
Local Government Service:
Alderman, Dalby; Mayor of Dalby, 1907-1909
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | MIN | Dalby | 26 Apr 1911 | 22 May 1915 | By-election |
Assembly | LIB | Dalby | 22 May 1915 | 16 Mar 1918 | |
Assembly | NAT | Dalby | 16 Mar 1918 | 9 Oct 1920 | |
Assembly | CNC | Dalby | 9 Oct 1920 | 8 May 1926 |
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Leader of the Opposition | 28 Jan 1920 | 11 Jul 1923 |
Additional Information
Notes:
Member, Dalby Hospital Board; Member, Pastoral and Agricultural Society; Member, Race Club; Member, Golf Club
Sources:
Image courtesy of John Oxley Library, State Library of Queensland, Neg:12352; Waterson, DB, A Biographical Register of the Queensland Parliament: 1860-1929, 2nd revised edition (Sydney: Casket Publications, 2001); Hughes, Colin A and BD Graham, Voting for the Queensland Legislative Assembly 1890-1964, (Canberra: ANU, Department of Political Science, 1974)
[Last Modified: Monday, 01 January 0001]