Hobbs, Howard William Thomas
Personal
Birth Date:
22 January 1950 (Brisbane)
Parents:
William Howard Foley Hobbs and Dorothea Knowles (nee Davidson)
Family:
Marilyn Ann Hooper on 9 January 1971, 1 son, 1 daughter
Education:
Tambo Convent; Columboola State School; Downlands
Religion:
Roman catholic
Career
Private Pilot; Grazier
Local Government Service:
Chairman, Tambo Shire Council, 1980-1987. Councillor Tambo Shire Council 1975-1980. Executive Member of the Western Queensland and the South West Queensland Local Government Associations
Military Service:
Military Service 49 RQR, Wacol
Party Positions:
- Ministerial Legislative Committee, Premier, Treasurer and the Arts, Land Management, Finance, Environment, Conservation and Tourism, Local Government and Racing, Health . 1987 - 1989
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | NP | Warrego | 1 Nov 1986 | 9 Sep 2008 | |
Assembly | LNP | Warrego | 9 Sep 2008 | 30 Jan 2015 | Did not contest |
Speeches:
Inaugural Speech
|
All Speeches
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Chair, Transport, Housing and Local Government Committee | 18 May 2012 | 6 Jan 2015 |
Shadow Minister for Local Government, Shadow Minister for Rural and Regional Queensland | 29 Nov 2010 | 11 Apr 2011 |
Shadow Minister for Local Government and Aboriginal and Torres Strait Island Partnerships | 6 Apr 2009 | 29 Nov 2010 |
Member, Estimates Committee C | 2008 | 2008 |
Shadow Minister for Local Government, Planning and Regional Development | 12 Aug 2008 | 5 Apr 2009 |
Shadow Minister for Main Roads and Local Government | 29 Jan 2008 | 12 Aug 2008 |
Member, Estimates Committee E | 2007 | 2007 |
Member, Estimates Committee F | 2006 | 2006 |
Shadow Minister for Local Government, Planning and Sport | 21 Sep 2006 | 29 Jan 2008 |
Shadow Minister for Local Government and Planning and Shadow Minister for Communities | 28 Sep 2005 | 21 Sep 2006 |
Member, Estimates Committee F | 2004 | 2004 |
Shadow Minister for State Development and Innovation | 8 Mar 2004 | 27 Sep 2005 |
Member, Estimates Committee E | 2003 | 2003 |
National Party Shadow Minister for Local Government and Planning, Regional and Rural Communities, and Trade | 9 Feb 2003 | 8 Mar 2004 |
Member, Estimates Committee E | 2002 | 2002 |
Member, Estimates Committee G | 2002 | 2002 |
Deputy Chairman, Parliamentary Crime and Misconduct Committee | 1 Jan 2002 | 22 Apr 2009 |
Member, Estimates Committee D | 2001 | 2001 |
Deputy Chairman, Parliamentary Criminal Justice Committee | 3 May 2001 | 31 Dec 2001 |
National Party Shadow Minister for Local Government and Planning, Regional and Rural Communities, and Racing | 12 Mar 2001 | 9 Feb 2003 |
Member, Estimates Committee G | 2000 | 2000 |
Member, Estimates Committee D | 1999 | 1999 |
Coalition Shadow Minister for Local Government, Planning, Regional and Rural Communities | 1 Mar 1999 | 12 Mar 2001 |
Member, Estimates Committee G | 1998 | 1998 |
Deputy Chairman, Select Committee on Travelsafe | 30 Jul 1998 | 12 Mar 2001 |
Shadow Minister for Local Government and Planning | 2 Jul 1998 | 1 Mar 1999 |
Chairman, Estimates Committee C | 4 Jun 1997 | 8 Jul 1997 |
Temporary Chairman of Committees | 2 Apr 1996 | 19 May 1998 |
Minister for Natural Resources | 26 Feb 1996 | 13 Feb 1998 |
Member, Estimates Committee F | 1995 | 1995 |
Member, Members' Ethics and Parliamentary Privileges Committee | 15 Sep 1995 | 2 Apr 1996 |
Member, Estimates Committee F | 1994 | 1994 |
Member, Select Committee of Privileges | 26 Oct 1994 | 20 Jun 1995 |
Coalition Shadow Minister for Lands and Water Resources November | 1992 | 1996 |
Shadow Minister for Land Management and Water Resources | 1990 | 1992 |
Shadow Minister for Land Management | 1990 | 1990 |
Additional Information
Notes:
Interests include polocrosse, clay target shooting and politics; Member: Queensland Outback Tourist Association, Senior Vice President Queensland Polocrosse Association
Sources:
Image sourced from the collection of Queensland Parliamentary Library and Research Service
[Last Modified: Wednesday, 26 July 2017]