Randell, James Henry (Jim)
Personal
Birth Date:
13 August 1928 (Mackay, Queensland)
Death Date:
21 June 2016 (, Queensland)
Parents:
James Clarence Randell and Winifred Mary (nee Williams)
Family:
Colleen Ivy Buchanan, 3 sons, 1 daughter
Education:
Carmila State Primary School
Religion:
Church of England
Career
Sugarcane farmer and grazier
Local Government Service:
Chairman, Broadsound Shire Council, 1979 to 1982; Councillor, Broadsound Shire Council, 1976 to 1979
Party Positions:
- Member, Government Party Committees: Local Government; Main Roads and Racing; Primary Industries; Industry and Technology; Northern Development and Community Services. 1987
- National Party Parliamentary Representative to National Party State Management Committee.
- Chairman, National Party Sugar Policy Committee.
- Member, Government Party Committees: Local Government; Main Roads and Racing; Mines and Energy; Water Resources and Maritime Services; Aboriginal and Island Affairs. 1983 - 1986
- Member, Government Party Committees: Primary Industries; Mines and Energy; Northern Development and Maritime Services; Tourism; National Parks, Sports and the Arts. 1982 - 1983
- Member, Government Party Committees: Water Resources; Aboriginal and Island Affairs. 1982 - 1983
Parliamentary Representation
House | Party | Electorate | From | To | Elected/Departure Reason |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Assembly | NP | Mirani | 29 Nov 1980 | 31 Mar 1994 |
Parliamentary Service
Description | From | To |
---|---|---|
Member, Select Committee for Members' Interests | 10 Nov 1992 | 31 Mar 1994 |
Member, Parliamentary Service Commission | 5 Nov 1992 | 31 Mar 1994 |
Member, Parliamentary Trade Delegation to Japan, China and Hong Kong | 1991 | |
Opposition Spokesman for the Sugar Industry | Jan 1991 | Nov 1992 |
Member, Parliamentary Committee of Public Works | Mar 1990 | Aug 1992 |
Opposition Spokesman on Administrative Services | Jan 1990 | Jan 1991 |
Minister for Works and Housing | 25 Sep 1989 | 7 Dec 1989 |
Minister for Local Government and Racing | 9 Dec 1987 | 25 Sep 1989 |
Member, Parliamentary Delegation to Fiji, Tonga and Samoa | 1984 | |
Temporary Chairman of Committees | 1983 | 1986 |
Member, Refreshment Rooms Committee | Mar 1983 | Aug 1983 |
Additional Information
Notes:
Interests include all sports, particularly junior sport, fishing and community affairs. Former member of the following organisations: the Australian Brahman Breeders Association; the Central Queensland Local Government Association; and the Mackay Regional Development Bureau.
Sources:
Image sourced from the collection of the Queensland Parliamentary Library and Research Service; Waterson, DB, Biographical Register of the Queensland Parliament 1981-1992, (Sydney: Casket Publications, 1993)
[Last Modified: Wednesday, 23 August 2017]